MI HB4299 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; evidence; consideration of videorecorded statements in certain proceedings; allow. Amends sec. 2163a of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.2163a). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4298'17, HB 4300'17
Title
Criminal procedure; evidence; consideration of videorecorded statements in certain proceedings; allow. Amends sec. 2163a of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.2163a). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4298'17, HB 4300'17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 89 (Y: 92 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-6 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-6 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-02-21 | House | Transmitted |
2018-02-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 89 Yeas 92 Nays 17 |
2018-02-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Substitute H-6 Adopted |
2018-02-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-01-30 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-6 |
2017-07-12 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-06-20 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-06-20 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-03-07 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/02/2017 |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-03-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced By Representative Jim Runestad |