MI HB4343 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-13)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-12 - Placed On Order Of Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-12 - Placed On Order Of Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Education: attendance; excused absence from public school for the purpose of sounding "Taps" at a military honor funeral for a deceased veteran; provide for. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1138a.
Title
Education: attendance; excused absence from public school for the purpose of sounding "Taps" at a military honor funeral for a deceased veteran; provide for. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1138a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 109 (Y: 105 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 109 (Y: 105 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education And Career Readiness |
2021-04-14 | House | Transmitted |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 109 Yeas 105 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-04-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-04-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-02-25 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/24/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2021-02-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Kevin Coleman |
Subjects
Education: attendance
Education: school districts
Education: students
Military affairs: other
Veterans: other
Education: school districts
Education: students
Military affairs: other
Veterans: other