MI HB4354 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
Pending: Senate Health Policy And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
Pending: Senate Health Policy And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance: health insurers; coverage for orally administered anticancer chemotherapy; provide equal treatment for. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding sec. 3406v. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4347'21
Title
Insurance: health insurers; coverage for orally administered anticancer chemotherapy; provide equal treatment for. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding sec. 3406v. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4347'21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 80 (Y: 91 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2021-03-24 | House | Transmitted |
2021-03-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 80 Yeas 91 Nays 15 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2021-03-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-03-23 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-03-23 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-03-23 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-03-18 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-02-25 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/24/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2021-02-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Daire Rendon |