MI HB4355 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-16 - Assigned Pa 134'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-16 - Assigned Pa 134'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Housing; condominium; auditing requirements; modify. Amends sec. 57 of 1978 PA 59 (MCL 559.157).
Title
Housing; condominium; auditing requirements; modify. Amends sec. 57 of 1978 PA 59 (MCL 559.157).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-10-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 387 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 194 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 194 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-16 | House | Assigned Pa 134'13 With Immediate Effect |
2013-10-16 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/15/2013 @ 4:16 Pm |
2013-10-16 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/15/2013 @ 3:05 Pm |
2013-10-08 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/4/2013 @ 11:42 Am |
2013-10-02 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2013-10-02 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2013-10-02 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2013-10-02 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2013-10-02 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 387 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2013-09-26 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2013-09-26 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2013-09-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2013-09-24 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-09-24 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2013-06-05 | House | Transmitted |
2013-06-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 194 Yeas 108 Nays 1 |
2013-06-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-06-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-06-04 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted And Amended |
2013-06-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-05-14 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2013-03-05 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/01/2013 |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2013-02-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-02-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Paul Clemente |