MI HB4361 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Assigned Pa 56'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Assigned Pa 56'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Gaming; lottery; lottery sales agent; provide for penalties for fraudulent activity related to food assistance benefits. Amends 1972 PA 239 (MCL 432.1 - 432.47) by adding sec. 24.
Title
Gaming; lottery; lottery sales agent; provide for penalties for fraudulent activity related to food assistance benefits. Amends 1972 PA 239 (MCL 432.1 - 432.47) by adding sec. 24.
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Victory [R] | Rep. Joel Johnson [R] | Sen. Kevin Daley [R] | Rep. Kurt Heise [R] |
Rep. Eileen Kowall [R] | Sen. Dan Lauwers [R] | Rep. Thomas Hooker [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 229 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 97 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 97 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-12 | House | Assigned Pa 56'13 With Immediate Effect |
2013-06-12 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/11/2013 @ 3:56 Pm |
2013-06-12 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/11/2013 @ 3:26 Pm |
2013-06-06 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/6/2013 @ 1:48 Pm |
2013-06-04 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-04 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2013-06-04 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 229 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2013-04-25 | House | Transmitted |
2013-04-25 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 97 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2013-04-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-04-23 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-04-23 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted And Amended |
2013-04-23 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-04-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2013-03-06 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/06/2013 |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2013-03-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced By Representative Roger Victory |