MI HB4377 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-09 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-09 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Children: protection; distribution of training package to individuals designated as mandatory reporters for child abuse or child neglect; require. Amends 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.621 - 722.638) by adding sec. 3b.
Title
Children: protection; distribution of training package to individuals designated as mandatory reporters for child abuse or child neglect; require. Amends 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.621 - 722.638) by adding sec. 3b.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 147 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 147 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Reassigned To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2019-06-19 | House | Transmitted |
2019-06-19 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 147 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-06-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-06-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-06-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-06-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-03-19 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/14/2019 |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-03-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Kristy Pagan |