MI HB4381 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Assigned Pa 32'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Assigned Pa 32'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Children; adoption; department designee to consent to adoption; allow. Amends sec. 43, ch. X of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 710.43).
Title
Children; adoption; department designee to consent to adoption; allow. Amends sec. 43, ch. X of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 710.43).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 222 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 96 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 96 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | House | Assigned Pa 32'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-05-24 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/24/2011 @ 9:35 Am |
2011-05-24 | House | Approved By The Governor 5/23/2011 @ 9:26 Am |
2011-05-24 | House | Presented To The Governor 5/19/2011 @ 2:52 Pm |
2011-05-19 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2011-05-19 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2011-05-19 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 222 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2011-05-03 | House | Transmitted |
2011-05-03 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 96 Yeas 109 Nays 1 |
2011-05-03 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-04-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-04-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-04-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-04-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2011-03-08 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/04/2011 |
2011-03-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2011-03-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-03-03 | House | Introduced By Representative Kenneth Kurtz |
Same As/Similar To
SB0218 (Same As) 2011-04-28 - Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors