MI HB4480 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Assigned Pa 95'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Assigned Pa 95'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Children; protection; factors determining best interest of child; modify in cases of domestic violence. Amends sec. 3 of 1970 PA 91 (MCL 722.23).
Title
Children; protection; factors determining best interest of child; modify in cases of domestic violence. Amends sec. 3 of 1970 PA 91 (MCL 722.23).
Sponsors
Rep. Kurt Heise [R] | Rep. Harvey Santana [D] | Rep. Ben Glardon [R] | Rep. Pam Faris [D] |
Rep. Holly Hughes [R] | Rep. Gary Glenn [R] | Rep. Amanda Price [R] | Rep. Lisa Lyons [R] |
Rep. Laura Cox [R] | Sen. Erika Geiss [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 160 (Y: 79 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 171 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 383 (Y: 76 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 171 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 383 (Y: 76 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Assigned Pa 95'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-05-04 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/3/2016 @ 11:44 Am |
2016-05-04 | House | Approved By The Governor 5/3/2016 @ 10:10 Am |
2016-04-26 | House | Presented To The Governor 4/25/2016 @ 1:11 Pm |
2016-04-19 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-04-19 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-04-19 | House | Roll Call # 160 Yeas 79 Nays 27 |
2016-04-19 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2016-04-14 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2016-04-14 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 171 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-10-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-10-22 | House | Transmitted |
2015-10-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 383 Yeas 76 Nays 28 |
2015-10-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-10-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-10-21 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2015-10-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-06-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-06-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-04-22 | House | Printed Bill Filed 04/22/2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2015-04-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-04-21 | House | Introduced By Representative Kurt Heise |