MI HB4485 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Transmitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Transmitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure: statute of limitations; statute of limitations for certain criminal sexual conduct violations; eliminate. Amends sec. 24, ch. VII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 767.24).
Title
Criminal procedure: statute of limitations; statute of limitations for certain criminal sexual conduct violations; eliminate. Amends sec. 24, ch. VII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 767.24).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 275 (Y: 57 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-31 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-31 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-27 | House | Transmitted |
2024-06-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 275 Yeas 57 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2024-06-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2024-06-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-06-26 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2024-06-26 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2024-06-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-10-31 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-10-31 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2023-05-02 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/27/2023 |
2023-04-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2023-04-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-04-27 | House | Introduced By Representative Reggie Miller |