MI HB4530 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-11 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-3)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-11 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-3)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elections: scheduling; primary election to be held in June; provide for, and eliminate May and August regular election dates. Amends secs. 3, 52, 53, 92, 93, 132, 133, 162, 163, 192, 193, 253, 254, 322, 345, 349, 370, 409a, 412, 432, 433, 467a, 534, 535, 551, 559, 591, 592, 598, 611, 623a, 641, 642, 642a, 686a, 737a, 821, 963 & 970e of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.3 et seq.).
Title
Elections: scheduling; primary election to be held in June; provide for, and eliminate May and August regular election dates. Amends secs. 3, 52, 53, 92, 93, 132, 133, 162, 163, 192, 193, 253, 254, 322, 345, 349, 370, 409a, 412, 432, 433, 467a, 534, 535, 551, 559, 591, 592, 598, 611, 623a, 641, 642, 642a, 686a, 737a, 821, 963 & 970e of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.3 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 148 (Y: 63 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 148 (Y: 63 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-3) |
2022-10-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-10-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-3) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2021-04-27 | House | Transmitted |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 148 Yeas 63 Nays 46 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2021-04-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-04-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-04-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-04-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-03-18 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/17/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2021-03-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Julie Calley |