MI HB4574 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - Assigned Pa 155'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - Assigned Pa 155'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Legislature; auditor general; provisions allowing auditor general access to records; clarify. Amends 1846 RS 1 (MCL 8.1 - 8.9) by adding sec. 6a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4336'19
Title
Legislature; auditor general; provisions allowing auditor general access to records; clarify. Amends 1846 RS 1 (MCL 8.1 - 8.9) by adding sec. 6a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4336'19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 337 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 178 (Y: 103 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 178 (Y: 103 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 155'19 With Immediate Effect |
2019-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/20/2019 10:54 Am |
2019-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/20/2019 10:06 Am |
2019-12-19 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/13/2019 02:57 Pm |
2019-12-10 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2019-12-10 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 337 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2019-08-28 | House | Transmitted |
2019-08-28 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 178 Yeas 103 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2019-08-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-08-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-08-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-06-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-05-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-05-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/09/2019 |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2019-05-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-05-08 | House | Introduced By Representative David Lagrand |