MI HB4590 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-26 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-26 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
State: symbol; monarch butterfly; designate as the official state butterfly. Creates new act.
Title
State: symbol; monarch butterfly; designate as the official state butterfly. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-26 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-09-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2023-05-17 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/16/2023 |
2023-05-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment, Tourism And Outdoor Recreation |
2023-05-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-05-16 | House | Introduced By Representative Brenda Carter |