MI HB4618 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection
Pending: Senate Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection
Pending: Senate Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Public employees and officers: compensation and benefits; regional airport authorities; include in the publicly funded health insurance contribution act. Amends sec. 2 of 2011 PA 152 (MCL 15.562).
Title
Public employees and officers: compensation and benefits; regional airport authorities; include in the publicly funded health insurance contribution act. Amends sec. 2 of 2011 PA 152 (MCL 15.562).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 37 (Y: 83 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection |
2024-04-23 | House | Transmitted |
2024-04-23 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 37 Yeas 83 Nays 24 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2024-04-23 | House | Read A Third Time |
2024-04-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-04-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-09-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-09-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-05-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/23/2023 |
2023-05-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Small Business |
2023-05-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-05-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Betsy Coffia |