MI HB4626 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-27 - Assigned Pa 100'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-27 - Assigned Pa 100'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education; teachers; discharge or demotion of a teacher on continuing tenure; revise permissible grounds for, change definition of demote, revise provisions concerning continuation of salary during suspension, and allow controlling board to require verification of ability to perform job at end of certain leave of absence. Amends sec. 4, art. I, secs. 1 & 3, art. IV & sec. 2, art. V of 1937 (Ex Sess) PA 4 (MCL 38.74 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4625'11, HB 4627'11, HB 4628'11
Title
Education; teachers; discharge or demotion of a teacher on continuing tenure; revise permissible grounds for, change definition of demote, revise provisions concerning continuation of salary during suspension, and allow controlling board to require verification of ability to perform job at end of certain leave of absence. Amends sec. 4, art. I, secs. 1 & 3, art. IV & sec. 2, art. V of 1937 (Ex Sess) PA 4 (MCL 38.74 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4625'11, HB 4627'11, HB 4628'11
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Scott [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-30 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 295 (Y: 60 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 440 (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 170 (Y: 61 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 440 (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 170 (Y: 61 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-27 | House | Assigned Pa 100'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-07-27 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/19/2011 @ 4:20 Pm |
2011-07-27 | House | Approved By The Governor 7/19/2011 @ 3:08 Pm |
2011-07-27 | House | Presented To The Governor 7/13/2011 @ 9:28 Am |
2011-06-30 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2011-06-30 | House | Roll Call # 295 Yeas 60 Nays 48 |
2011-06-30 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2011-06-30 | House | Rule Suspended |
2011-06-30 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2011-06-30 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 440 Yeas 25 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 As Amended |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Substitute S-2 As Amended Concurred In |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 And Amendment(s) |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-06-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2011-06-09 | House | Transmitted |
2011-06-09 | House | Title Amended |
2011-06-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 170 Yeas 61 Nays 46 |
2011-06-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-06-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-06-08 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted And Amended |
2011-06-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-05-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-05-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2011-05-11 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/11/2011 |
2011-05-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2011-05-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-05-10 | House | Introduced By Representative Paul Scott |