MI HB4638 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-19 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-19 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Children: services; powers and duties of the child advocate; modify. Amends title & secs. 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 5a, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11 & 12 of 1994 PA 204 (MCL 722.921 et seq.).
Title
Children: services; powers and duties of the child advocate; modify. Amends title & secs. 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 5a, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11 & 12 of 1994 PA 204 (MCL 722.921 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-09-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2023-05-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/23/2023 |
2023-05-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2023-05-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-05-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Jason Hoskins |