MI HB4658 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-31 - Assigned Pa 257'15 With Immediate Effect 2015 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-31 - Assigned Pa 257'15 With Immediate Effect 2015 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil procedure; other; collection of court-ordered financial obligations from judgments against the state; allow. Amends 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.101 - 600.9947) by adding sec. 6096.
Title
Civil procedure; other; collection of court-ordered financial obligations from judgments against the state; allow. Amends 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.101 - 600.9947) by adding sec. 6096.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael McCready [R] | Rep. Ben Glardon [R] | Rep. Tim Kelly [R] | Rep. Bruce Rendon [R] |
Rep. David Maturen [R] | Rep. Klint Kesto [R] | Rep. Henry Vaupel [R] | Rep. Eric Leutheuser [R] |
Rep. Edward Canfield [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-12-16 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 492 (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 607 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 299 (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 607 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 299 (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 257'15 With Immediate Effect 2015 Addenda |
2015-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/23/2015 @ 2:50 Pm 2015 Addenda |
2015-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/23/2015 @ 9:36 Am 2015 Addenda |
2015-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/21/2015 @ 11:32 Am 2015 Addenda |
2015-12-16 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2015-12-16 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2015-12-16 | House | Roll Call # 492 Yeas 103 Nays 2 |
2015-12-16 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2015-12-15 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2015-12-15 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2015-12-15 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2015-12-15 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 607 Yeas 36 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2015-12-15 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2015-12-15 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2015-12-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2015-12-15 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2015-12-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-12-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2015-12-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-12-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2015-09-16 | House | Transmitted |
2015-09-16 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 299 Yeas 102 Nays 1 |
2015-09-16 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-09-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-09-09 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2015-09-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-08-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-08-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-06-03 | House | Printed Bill Filed 06/03/2015 |
2015-06-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2015-06-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-06-02 | House | Introduced By Representative Michael Mccready |