MI HB4673 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-09 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-09 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Crime victims: notices; notice to crime victim when a prisoner is eligible to receive credits toward sentence; require. Amends secs. 13 & 41 of 1985 PA 87 (MCL 780.763 & 780.791). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4670'21
Title
Crime victims: notices; notice to crime victim when a prisoner is eligible to receive credits toward sentence; require. Amends secs. 13 & 41 of 1985 PA 87 (MCL 780.763 & 780.791). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4670'21
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Calley [R] | Rep. Bronna Kahle [R] | Rep. Bradley Slagh [R] | Rep. Bryan Posthumus [R] |
Rep. Tyrone Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-11-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-11-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-04-22 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/21/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Rules And Competitiveness |
2021-04-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-04-21 | House | Introduced By Representative Julie Calley |