MI HB4682 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recreation: other; responsibilities of property owners under the recreational trespassing law; modify. Amends sec. 73102 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.73102).
Title
Recreation: other; responsibilities of property owners under the recreational trespassing law; modify. Amends sec. 73102 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.73102).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-02-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-05-30 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/25/2023 |
2023-05-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment, Tourism And Outdoor Recreation |
2023-05-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-05-25 | House | Introduced By Representative Bradley Slagh |