MI HB4709 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-15 - Assigned Pa 214'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-15 - Assigned Pa 214'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; other; reference to "human monstrosity"; eliminate. Amends sec. 347 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.347).
Title
Crimes; other; reference to "human monstrosity"; eliminate. Amends sec. 347 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.347).
Sponsors
Sen. John Bizon [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-12-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 539 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 292 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 292 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-15 | House | Assigned Pa 214'15 With Immediate Effect |
2015-12-15 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/15/2015 @ 3:50 Pm |
2015-12-15 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/15/2015 @ 3:18 Pm |
2015-12-09 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/8/2015 @ 2:00 Pm |
2015-12-02 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2015-12-02 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2015-12-02 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2015-12-02 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2015-12-02 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 539 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-08-19 | House | Transmitted |
2015-08-19 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 292 Yeas 105 Nays 0 |
2015-08-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-08-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-08-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-06-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-06-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-06-16 | House | Printed Bill Filed 06/12/2015 |
2015-06-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2015-06-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-06-11 | House | Introduced By Representative John Bizon |