MI HB4721 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-14 - Assigned Pa 73'09 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-14 - Assigned Pa 73'09 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; supplemental; multisection school aid supplemental for 2008-2009; provide for. Amends secs. 6, 11, 11j, 11n, 20, 22a, 22b, 26a, 31a, 51a, 51c, 53a & 94a of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1606 et seq.) & adds sec. 98a.
Title
Appropriations; supplemental; multisection school aid supplemental for 2008-2009; provide for. Amends secs. 6, 11, 11j, 11n, 20, 22a, 22b, 26a, 31a, 51a, 51c, 53a & 94a of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1606 et seq.) & adds sec. 98a.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Brown [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-06-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-14 | Assigned Pa 73'09 With Immediate Effect | |
2009-07-14 | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/9/2009 @ 11:14 Am | |
2009-07-14 | Approved By The Governor 7/9/2009 @ 10:55 Am | |
2009-07-14 | Presented To The Governor 7/1/2009 @ 9:52 Am | |
2009-06-25 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | |
2009-06-25 | Title Amendment Agreed To | |
2009-06-25 | Roll Call # 352 Yeas 108 Nays 0 | |
2009-06-25 | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2009-06-25 | Rule Suspended | |
2009-06-25 | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules | |
2009-06-25 | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Title Amendment | |
2009-06-24 | Inserted Full Title | |
2009-06-24 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 337 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-06-24 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-06-24 | Rules Suspended | |
2009-06-24 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended | |
2009-06-24 | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In | |
2009-06-24 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) | |
2009-06-23 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-06-23 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-06-23 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-06-16 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | |
2009-06-11 | Transmitted | |
2009-06-11 | Title Amended | |
2009-06-11 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 288 Yeas 108 Nays 0 | |
2009-06-11 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-06-11 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-06-11 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-06-11 | Substitute H-2 Adopted And Amended | |
2009-06-11 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-06-10 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-06-10 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 | |
2009-03-31 | Printed Bill Filed 03/27/2009 | |
2009-03-26 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | |
2009-03-26 | Read A First Time | |
2009-03-26 | Introduced By Representative Terry Brown |