MI HB4729 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Assigned Pa 67'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Assigned Pa 67'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations: zero budget; omnibus budget appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2019-2020. Creates appropriation act.
Title
Appropriations: zero budget; omnibus budget appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2019-2020. Creates appropriation act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 190 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 128 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 165 (Y: 57 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 128 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 165 (Y: 57 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | House | Assigned Pa 67'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-03-25 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 03/30/2020 09:32 Am |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved By The Governor 03/30/2020 08:40 Am |
2020-03-17 | House | Presented To The Governor 03/19/2020 01:24 Pm |
2020-03-17 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-03-17 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2020-03-17 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 190 Yeas 92 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 18 |
2020-03-17 | House | Senate Substitute (s-3) Concurred In |
2020-03-17 | House | Rule Suspended |
2020-03-17 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-3) With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 128 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-3) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Substitute (s-3) Concurred In |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-3) |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-06-20 | House | Transmitted |
2019-06-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 165 Yeas 57 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-06-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-06-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-06-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-06-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-06-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-06-18 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/18/2019 |
2019-06-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2019-06-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-06-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Shane Hernandez |