MI HB4737 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-09-10 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-09-10 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Crime victims; rights; restitution of certain costs incurred by victims of identity theft; amend William Van Regenmorter crime victim's rights act to require. Amends secs. 4a, 16, 33b, 44, 64a & 76 of 1985 PA 87 (MCL 780.754a et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4736'09, HB 4738'09
Title
Crime victims; rights; restitution of certain costs incurred by victims of identity theft; amend William Van Regenmorter crime victim's rights act to require. Amends secs. 4a, 16, 33b, 44, 64a & 76 of 1985 PA 87 (MCL 780.754a et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4736'09, HB 4738'09
Sponsors
Rep. James Bolger [R] | Rep. Fred Durhal [D] | Rep. Gabe Leland [D] | Rep. Matthew Lori [R] |
Rep. Tim Melton [D] | Rep. Joel Sheltrown [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-10 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | |
2009-09-09 | Transmitted | |
2009-09-09 | Title Amended | |
2009-09-09 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 416 Yeas 108 Nays 0 | |
2009-09-09 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-09-09 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-09-09 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-09-09 | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended | |
2009-09-09 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-07-15 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-07-15 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2009-04-01 | Printed Bill Filed 04/01/2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | |
2009-03-31 | Read A First Time | |
2009-03-31 | Introduced By Representative Matt Lori |