MI HB4764 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-14 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-14 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health; other; children's safe product act; add definitions. Amends sec. 5491 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.5491). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4763'09, HB 4765'09, HB 4766'09, HB 4767'09, HB 4768'09, HB 4769'09
Title
Health; other; children's safe product act; add definitions. Amends sec. 5491 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.5491). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4763'09, HB 4765'09, HB 4766'09, HB 4767'09, HB 4768'09, HB 4769'09
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy | |
2009-05-13 | Transmitted | |
2009-05-13 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 223 Yeas 63 Nays 44 | |
2009-05-13 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-05-13 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-05-13 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Substitute H-1 Adopted | |
2009-05-13 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-04-30 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-04-30 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2009-04-21 | Printed Bill Filed 04/03/2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Referred To Committee On Great Lakes And Environment | |
2009-04-02 | Read A First Time | |
2009-04-02 | Introduced By Representative Douglas Geiss |
Subjects
Consumer protection, other
Health, other
State agencies (existing), community health
Trade, consumer goods and services
Health, other
State agencies (existing), community health
Trade, consumer goods and services