MI HB4764 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-28 - Printed Bill Filed 05/24/2013
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-28 - Printed Bill Filed 05/24/2013
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Civil procedure; foreclosure; mortgage modification program; adopt federal loss mitigation program. Amends sec. 3204 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.3204). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4765'13, HB 4766'13, HB 4767'13
Title
Civil procedure; foreclosure; mortgage modification program; adopt federal loss mitigation program. Amends sec. 3204 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.3204). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4765'13, HB 4766'13, HB 4767'13
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/24/2013 |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Services |
2013-05-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-05-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Mike Callton |
Same As/Similar To
SB0380 (Same As) 2013-07-31 - Assigned Pa 0103'13 With Immediate Effect
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2013-HB-4764 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billintroduced/House/htm/2013-HIB-4764.htm |