MI HB4766 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-14 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-14 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health; children; children's safe products act; require manufacturers and distributors to report certain information. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 5495. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4763'09, HB 4764'09, HB 4765'09, HB 4767'09, HB 4768'09, HB 4769'09
Title
Health; children; children's safe products act; require manufacturers and distributors to report certain information. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 5495. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4763'09, HB 4764'09, HB 4765'09, HB 4767'09, HB 4768'09, HB 4769'09
Sponsors
Rep. Vicki Barnett [D] | Rep. Lisa Brown [D] | Rep. Terry Brown [D] | Rep. Pamela Byrnes [D] |
Rep. Barb Byrum [D] | Rep. Fred Durhal [D] | Rep. John Espinoza [D] | Rep. Douglas Geiss [D] |
Rep. Lee Gonzales [D] | Rep. Jennifer Haase [D] | Rep. Harold Haugh [D] | Rep. Robert Jones [D] |
Rep. Deb Kennedy [D] | Rep. Gabe Leland [D] | Rep. Ellen Lipton [D] | Rep. Lesia Liss [D] |
Rep. Gary McDowell [D] | Rep. Mark Meadows [D] | Rep. Tim Melton [D] | Rep. David Nathan [D] |
Rep. Judy Nerat [D] | Rep. Gino Polidori [D] | Rep. Daniel Scripps [D] | Rep. Kate Segal [D] |
Rep. Dian Slavens [D] | Rep. Alma Smith [D] | Rep. Jon Switalski [D] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D] |
Rep. Mary Valentine [D] | Sen. Rebekah Warren [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy | |
2009-05-13 | Transmitted | |
2009-05-13 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 225 Yeas 63 Nays 45 | |
2009-05-13 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-05-13 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-05-13 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Substitute H-2 Adopted | |
2009-05-13 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-04-30 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-04-30 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 | |
2009-04-21 | Printed Bill Filed 04/03/2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Referred To Committee On Great Lakes And Environment | |
2009-04-02 | Read A First Time | |
2009-04-02 | Introduced By Representative Kate Segal |
Subjects
Businesses, distributors and dealers
Consumer protection, other
Health, children
State agencies (existing), community health
Trade, consumer goods and services
Consumer protection, other
Health, children
State agencies (existing), community health
Trade, consumer goods and services