MI HB4782 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-28 - Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism
Pending: Senate Commerce & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-28 - Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism
Pending: Senate Commerce & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Trade; vehicles; recreational vehicle manufacturers, wholesalers, warrantors, and dealers; regulate. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4781'09
Title
Trade; vehicles; recreational vehicle manufacturers, wholesalers, warrantors, and dealers; regulate. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4781'09
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment(s) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism | |
2009-04-23 | Transmitted | |
2009-04-23 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 171 Yeas 98 Nays 5 | |
2009-04-23 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-04-23 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-04-23 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-04-23 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-04-21 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-04-21 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment(s) | |
2009-04-21 | Printed Bill Filed 04/03/2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Referred To Committee On Tourism, Outdoor Recreation And Natural Resources | |
2009-04-02 | Read A First Time | |
2009-04-02 | Introduced By Representative Joel Sheltrown |
Subjects
Businesses, franchises
Occupations, vehicles, dealers and repair facilities
Trade, fair trade practices
Trade, vehicles
Occupations, vehicles, dealers and repair facilities
Trade, fair trade practices
Trade, vehicles