MI HB4787 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-16 - Assigned Pa 137'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-16 - Assigned Pa 137'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health facilities; certificate of need; fees and assessments; modify. Amends sec. 20161 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.20161).
Title
Health facilities; certificate of need; fees and assessments; modify. Amends sec. 20161 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.20161).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-10-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 383 (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 281 (Y: 82 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 281 (Y: 82 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-16 | House | Assigned Pa 137'13 With Immediate Effect |
2013-10-16 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/15/2013 @ 4:22 Pm |
2013-10-16 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/15/2013 @ 12:16 Pm |
2013-10-08 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/4/2013 @ 11:46 Am |
2013-10-01 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2013-10-01 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2013-10-01 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2013-10-01 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2013-10-01 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 383 Yeas 23 Nays 14 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2013-10-01 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2013-10-01 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2013-10-01 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2013-10-01 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2013-09-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2013-09-24 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-09-24 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2013-09-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2013-09-12 | House | Transmitted |
2013-09-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 281 Yeas 82 Nays 26 |
2013-09-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-06-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-06-18 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2013-06-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-06-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-06-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2013-05-30 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/30/2013 |
2013-05-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2013-05-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-05-29 | House | Introduced By Representative Matt Lori |