MI HB4787 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Assigned Pa 25'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Assigned Pa 25'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; fishing; ice shanty identification requirements and removal dates; modify. Amends secs. 46502, 46507 & 46508 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.46502 et seq.) & repeals secs. 46503, 46504, 46505 & 46506 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.46503 et seq.).
Title
Natural resources; fishing; ice shanty identification requirements and removal dates; modify. Amends secs. 46502, 46507 & 46508 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.46502 et seq.) & repeals secs. 46503, 46504, 46505 & 46506 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.46503 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 55 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 400 (Y: 96 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 400 (Y: 96 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | Assigned Pa 25'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 2/14/2018 @ 1:56 Pm |
2018-02-14 | House | Approved By The Governor 2/14/2018 @ 12:20 Pm |
2018-02-06 | House | Presented To The Governor 2/5/2018 @ 2:27 Pm |
2018-02-01 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-02-01 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-02-01 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 55 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Outdoor Recreation And Tourism |
2017-11-09 | House | Transmitted |
2017-11-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 400 Yeas 96 Nays 11 |
2017-11-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-11-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-11-08 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2017-11-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-11-01 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-11-01 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2017-07-12 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/20/2017 |
2017-06-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2017-06-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-06-20 | House | Introduced By Representative Curt Vanderwall |