MI HB4787 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-15 - Assigned Pa 148'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-15 - Assigned Pa 148'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control: driver license; waiver of knowledge test for an individual with military commercial motor vehicle experience; provide for. Amends sec. 312f of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.312f).
Title
Traffic control: driver license; waiver of knowledge test for an individual with military commercial motor vehicle experience; provide for. Amends sec. 312f of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.312f).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 608 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 474 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 373 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 474 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 373 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-15 | House | Assigned Pa 148'21 With Immediate Effect |
2021-12-15 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2021 12:30 Pm |
2021-12-15 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/23/2021 10:18 Am |
2021-12-15 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/17/2021 11:12 Am |
2021-12-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2021-12-14 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2021-12-14 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 608 Yeas 103 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2021-12-14 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2021-12-09 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2021-12-09 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Title Amended |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 474 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2021-06-24 | House | Transmitted |
2021-06-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 373 Yeas 107 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2021-06-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-06-23 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-06-23 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-06-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-06-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-05-06 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/05/2021 |
2021-05-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2021-05-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-05-05 | House | Introduced By Representative Gregory Markkanen |