MI HB4788 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-28 - Assigned Pa 154'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-28 - Assigned Pa 154'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; plant rehabilitation; definition of "industrial property"; expand to include certain federal reserve bank operations. Amends sec. 2 of 1974 PA 198 (MCL 207.552).
Title
Economic development; plant rehabilitation; definition of "industrial property"; expand to include certain federal reserve bank operations. Amends sec. 2 of 1974 PA 198 (MCL 207.552).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 490 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-09-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 227 (Y: 88 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 227 (Y: 88 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-28 | House | Assigned Pa 154'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-09-28 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 9/27/2011 @ 3:54 Pm |
2011-09-28 | House | Approved By The Governor 9/27/2011 @ 3:13 Pm |
2011-09-21 | House | Presented To The Governor 9/21/2011 @ 9:50 Am |
2011-09-20 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2011-09-20 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2011-09-20 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 490 Yeas 34 Nays 2 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development |
2011-06-23 | House | Transmitted |
2011-06-23 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 227 Yeas 88 Nays 22 |
2011-06-23 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-06-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-06-22 | House | Amended |
2011-06-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-06-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-06-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2011-06-21 | House | Printed Bill Filed 06/17/2011 |
2011-06-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2011-06-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-06-16 | House | Introduced By Representative Harvey Santana |