MI HB4790 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-18 - Assigned Pa 223'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-18 - Assigned Pa 223'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School aid; membership; counting of nonresident shared time pupils in membership; expand to include kindergarten. Amends sec. 6 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1606). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4594'15
Title
School aid; membership; counting of nonresident shared time pupils in membership; expand to include kindergarten. Amends sec. 6 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1606). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4594'15
Sponsors
Sen. Ed McBroom [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-12-10 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 468 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 564 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 303 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 564 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 303 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-18 | House | Assigned Pa 223'15 With Immediate Effect |
2015-12-18 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/17/2015 @ 2:19 Pm |
2015-12-18 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/17/2015 @ 8:42 Am |
2015-12-15 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/14/2015 @ 3:44 Pm |
2015-12-10 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2015-12-10 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2015-12-10 | House | Roll Call # 468 Yeas 106 Nays 0 |
2015-12-10 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2015-12-09 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2015-12-09 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2015-12-09 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2015-12-09 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 564 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Reassigned To Committee On Education |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2015-09-17 | House | Transmitted |
2015-09-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 303 Yeas 101 Nays 0 |
2015-09-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-09-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-09-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-09-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-09-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-07-21 | House | Printed Bill Filed 07/15/2015 |
2015-07-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2015-07-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-07-15 | House | Introduced By Representative Ed Mcbroom |
Subjects
Education: elementary
Education: financing
Education: nonpublic
Education: school districts
Education: students
School aid: membership
School aid: other
Education: financing
Education: nonpublic
Education: school districts
Education: students
School aid: membership
School aid: other