MI HB4821 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-04 - Referred To Committee On Campaign And Election Oversight
Pending: Senate Campaign & Election Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-04 - Referred To Committee On Campaign And Election Oversight
Pending: Senate Campaign & Election Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; recounts; recount deposit; increase, and provide for payment of actual costs to conduct the recount under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 867 & 881 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.867 & 168.881).
Title
Elections; recounts; recount deposit; increase, and provide for payment of actual costs to conduct the recount under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 867 & 881 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.867 & 168.881).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | Referred To Committee On Campaign And Election Oversight | |
2010-03-03 | Transmitted | |
2010-03-03 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 49 Yeas 91 Nays 16 | |
2010-03-03 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-03-03 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-03-03 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-03-03 | Substitute H-2 Adopted | |
2010-03-03 | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted | |
2010-03-03 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-02-17 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-02-17 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2009-04-23 | Printed Bill Filed 04/23/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Referred To Committee On Ethics And Elections | |
2009-04-22 | Read A First Time | |
2009-04-22 | Introduced By Representative Dan Scripps |