MI HB4823 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - Referred To Committee On Elections
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - Referred To Committee On Elections
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax: millage; regional enhancement millage ballot language; revise. Amends sec. 24f of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.24f).
Title
Property tax: millage; regional enhancement millage ballot language; revise. Amends sec. 24f of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.24f).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 356 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2019-12-11 | House | Transmitted |
2019-12-11 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 356 Yeas 107 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-12-11 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-12-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-12-10 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2019-12-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2019-11-07 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-10-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-10-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-10-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-08-13 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 08/13/2019 |
2019-08-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2019-08-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-08-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Joseph Bellino |