MI HB4913 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Assigned Pa 248'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Assigned Pa 248'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax; classification; requirements to withdraw commercial forestland from ad valorem property tax; modify. Amends sec. 51108 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.51108).
Title
Property tax; classification; requirements to withdraw commercial forestland from ad valorem property tax; modify. Amends sec. 51108 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.51108).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 494 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 380 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 380 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | House | Assigned Pa 248'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-07-18 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/2/2012 @ 3:35 Pm |
2012-07-18 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/25/2012 @ 4:02 Pm |
2012-07-18 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/21/2012 @ 3:28 Pm |
2012-06-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-06-13 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-06-13 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 494 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes |
2011-10-05 | House | Transmitted |
2011-10-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 380 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2011-10-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-10-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-10-04 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2011-10-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-09-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-09-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2011-09-08 | House | Printed Bill Filed 09/08/2011 |
2011-09-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Tourism, And Outdoor Recreation |
2011-09-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-09-07 | House | Introduced By Representative Frank Foster |