MI HB4991 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-19 - Placed On Order Of General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-19 - Placed On Order Of General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Children; adoption; objection to placements by child placing agency based on religious or moral convictions; allow. Amends 1973 PA 116 (MCL 722.111 - 722.128) by adding sec. 14e. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4927'13, HB 4928'13
Title
Children; adoption; objection to placements by child placing agency based on religious or moral convictions; allow. Amends 1973 PA 116 (MCL 722.111 - 722.128) by adding sec. 14e. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4927'13, HB 4928'13
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 618 (Y: 59 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2014-12-04 | House | Transmitted |
2014-12-04 | House | Title Amended |
2014-12-04 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 618 Yeas 59 Nays 50 |
2014-12-04 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-04 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-12-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-04 | House | Substitute H-4 Adopted |
2014-12-04 | House | Substitute H-3 Not Adopted |
2014-12-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-09-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-09-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2013-09-18 | House | Printed Bill Filed 09/18/2013 |
2013-09-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2013-09-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-09-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Tom Leonard |