MI HB4991 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 588'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 588'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax; exemptions; compensation received for wrongful imprisonment; exempt from taxable income and total household resources under the homestead property tax credit. Amends secs. 30 & 508 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.30 & 206.508).
Title
Individual income tax; exemptions; compensation received for wrongful imprisonment; exempt from taxable income and total household resources under the homestead property tax credit. Amends secs. 30 & 508 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.30 & 206.508).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 984 (Y: 56 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 979 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 263 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 979 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 263 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 588'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 4:28 Pm |
2018-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/28/2018 @ 1:31 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/27/2018 @ 5:00 Pm |
2018-12-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-21 | House | Re-returned From Senate With Concurrence To House Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute S-2 |
2018-12-21 | Senate | House Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute 1042 Concurred In |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Returned From House With Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute S-2 |
2018-12-21 | House | Retransmitted |
2018-12-21 | House | Rep. David Lagrand Removed As Cosponsor |
2018-12-21 | House | Reps. John Reilly, Stephanie Chang, Jim Runestad Removed As Co-sponsors |
2018-12-21 | House | Reps. Robert Wittenberg, Sherry Gay-dagnogo, Holly Hughes Removed As Co-sponsors |
2018-12-21 | House | Rep. Martin Howrylak Removed As Sponsor |
2018-12-21 | House | Roll Call # 984 Yeas 56 Nays 51 |
2018-12-21 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In As Amended |
2018-12-21 | House | Amended |
2018-12-20 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-12-20 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 979 Yeas 26 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted |
2018-05-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 263 Yeas 107 Nays 2 |
2018-05-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-05-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-05-01 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2018-05-01 | House | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted |
2018-05-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-09-20 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/19/2017 |
2017-09-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2017-09-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-09-19 | House | Introduced By Representative Martin Howrylak |
Subjects
Corrections: prisoners
Individual income tax: exemptions
Individual income tax: income
Individual income tax: property tax credit
Individual income tax: exemptions
Individual income tax: income
Individual income tax: property tax credit