MI HB5018 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Assigned Pa 36'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Assigned Pa 36'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; other; Michigan promotion fund; create. Amends 1984 PA 270 (MCL 125.2001 - 125.2094) by adding ch. 3A. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0619'09
Title
Economic development; other; Michigan promotion fund; create. Amends 1984 PA 270 (MCL 125.2001 - 125.2094) by adding ch. 3A. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0619'09
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Assigned Pa 36'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-04-13 | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/31/2010 @ 1:43 Pm | |
2010-04-13 | Approved By The Governor 3/31/2010 @ 1:27 Pm | |
2010-04-13 | Presented To The Governor 3/29/2010 @ 10:11 Am | |
2010-03-25 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-03-25 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2010-03-25 | Roll Call # 123 Yeas 100 Nays 9 | |
2010-03-25 | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2010-03-25 | Rule Suspended | |
2010-03-25 | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules | |
2010-03-25 | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title | |
2010-03-25 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-03-25 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 174 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-03-25 | Amendment(s) Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Amendment(s) Defeated | |
2010-03-25 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-03-25 | Rules Suspended | |
2010-03-25 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-03-25 | Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2010-03-25 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-02-23 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-02-23 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-02-23 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-12-19 | Referred To Committee On Finance | |
2009-12-17 | Transmitted | |
2009-12-17 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 647 Yeas 98 Nays 7 | |
2009-12-17 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-12-17 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-12-17 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-12-17 | Substitute H-2 Adopted And Amended | |
2009-12-17 | Amended | |
2009-12-17 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-06-23 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-06-23 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2009-06-02 | Printed Bill Filed 05/29/2009 | |
2009-05-28 | Referred To Committee On Tourism, Outdoor Recreation And Natural Resources | |
2009-05-28 | Read A First Time | |
2009-05-28 | Introduced By Representative David Nathan |