MI HB5171 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Human services: medical services; coverage for mental health screenings for new mothers; require. Amends sec. 109 of 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.109). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5169'23
Title
Human services: medical services; coverage for mental health screenings for new mothers; require. Amends sec. 109 of 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.109). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5169'23
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 235 (Y: 97 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2024-06-26 | House | Transmitted |
2024-06-26 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 235 Yeas 97 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2024-06-26 | House | Read A Third Time |
2024-06-26 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2024-06-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-06-26 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2024-06-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-11-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-11-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2023-10-18 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/17/2023 |
2023-10-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2023-10-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-10-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Kristian Grant |
Same As/Similar To
HB5169 (Same As) 2024-06-26 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy