MI HB5435 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance: health insurers; coverage for pharmacist prescribing hormonal contraceptives; require. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding sec. 3406tt. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5436'24
Title
Insurance: health insurers; coverage for pharmacist prescribing hormonal contraceptives; require. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding sec. 3406tt. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5436'24
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-04-18 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2024-02-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/13/2024 |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2024-02-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Stephanie A. Young |
Same As/Similar To
HB5436 (Same As) 2024-04-18 - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2)