MI HB5484 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-02 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-02 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Health: anatomical gifts; HIV positive organ donations; allow when recipient is HIV positive. Amends sec. 9123 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.9123).
Title
Health: anatomical gifts; HIV positive organ donations; allow when recipient is HIV positive. Amends sec. 9123 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.9123).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-02-12 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/12/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2020-02-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Rebekah Warren |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-HB-5484 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2020-HIB-5484.htm |