MI HB5490 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-14 - Assigned Pa 207'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-14 - Assigned Pa 207'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Medical marihuana: administration; court-appointed individual to operate medical marihuana facility; allow, and require promulgation of rules to establish procedures and standards. Amends secs. 102, 206, 303 & 401 of 2016 PA 281 (MCL 333.27102er seq.) & adds sec. 206a.
Title
Medical marihuana: administration; court-appointed individual to operate medical marihuana facility; allow, and require promulgation of rules to establish procedures and standards. Amends secs. 102, 206, 303 & 401 of 2016 PA 281 (MCL 333.27102er seq.) & adds sec. 206a.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandt Iden [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-24 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 460 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 342 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 131 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 342 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 131 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-14 | House | Assigned Pa 207'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-10-14 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/15/2020 12:26 Pm |
2020-10-14 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/15/2020 09:56 Am |
2020-10-01 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/01/2020 01:06 Pm |
2020-09-24 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-09-24 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2020-09-24 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 460 Yeas 103 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 6 |
2020-09-24 | House | Senate Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2020-09-24 | House | Rule Suspended |
2020-09-24 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-09-24 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-2) With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Title Amended |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 342 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Adopted |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2020-03-03 | House | Transmitted |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 131 Yeas 107 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2020-03-03 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-02-26 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2020-02-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-02-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-02-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-02-18 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/18/2020 |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2020-02-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-02-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Brandt Iden |