MI HB5497 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-05 - Recommendation Concurred In
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-05 - Recommendation Concurred In
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Health facilities; emergency medical services; amount of liability coverage required for certain hospital aircraft transport vehicles; modify. Amends sec. 20934 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.20934).
Title
Health facilities; emergency medical services; amount of liability coverage required for certain hospital aircraft transport vehicles; modify. Amends sec. 20934 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.20934).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Insurance (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-05 | House | Recommendation Concurred In |
2012-06-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Insurance |
2012-03-21 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/21/2012 |
2012-03-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2012-03-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-03-20 | House | Introduced By Representative Greg Macmaster |