MI HB5497 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - Referred To Committee On Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - Referred To Committee On Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; electricians; certain veterans; revise experience requirements and waive certain license, registration, and application fees. Amends secs. 3 & 3d of 1956 PA 217 (MCL 338.883 & 338.883d).
Title
Occupations; electricians; certain veterans; revise experience requirements and waive certain license, registration, and application fees. Amends secs. 3 & 3d of 1956 PA 217 (MCL 338.883 & 338.883d).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 382 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security |
2014-06-10 | House | Transmitted |
2014-06-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 382 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2014-06-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-06-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-06-04 | House | Amended |
2014-06-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-05-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-05-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-05-01 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/01/2014 |
2014-04-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Military And Veterans Affairs |
2014-04-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-04-30 | House | Introduced By Representative Robert Kosowski |
Subjects
Occupations, electricians
Occupations, licensing fees
State agencies (existing), licensing and regulatory affairs
Veterans, other
Occupations, licensing fees
State agencies (existing), licensing and regulatory affairs
Veterans, other