MI HB5504 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; traffic regulation; requirement of audible signal when being overtaken and passed by another vehicle on the right; eliminate. Amends sec. 636 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.636).
Title
Traffic control; traffic regulation; requirement of audible signal when being overtaken and passed by another vehicle on the right; eliminate. Amends sec. 636 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.636).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 259 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2018-05-01 | House | Transmitted |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 259 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2018-05-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-04-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-02-20 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-02-01 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/31/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2018-01-31 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced By Representative Robert Wittenberg |