MI HB5523 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Referred To Committee On Economic And Community Development
Pending: Senate Economic And Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Referred To Committee On Economic And Community Development
Pending: Senate Economic And Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Human services: other; bureau of community services and a commission on economic and social opportunity; create. Creates new act.
Title
Human services: other; bureau of community services and a commission on economic and social opportunity; create. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 223 (Y: 84 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic And Community Development |
2024-06-25 | House | Transmitted |
2024-06-25 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 223 Yeas 84 Nays 26 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2024-06-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2024-06-25 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2024-06-25 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-06-25 | House | Read A Second Time |
2024-04-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-04-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2024-02-22 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/22/2024 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Small Business |
2024-02-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-02-22 | House | Introduced By Representative Carol Glanville |