MI HB5535 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Affairs
Pending: Senate Regulatory Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Affairs
Pending: Senate Regulatory Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations: pawnbrokers; allowable rate of interest charged by pawnbrokers; increase, and prescribe civil sanctions. Amends title & sec. 18 of 1917 PA 273 (MCL 446.218). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5536'24
Title
Occupations: pawnbrokers; allowable rate of interest charged by pawnbrokers; increase, and prescribe civil sanctions. Amends title & sec. 18 of 1917 PA 273 (MCL 446.218). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5536'24
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 289 (Y: 88 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Affairs |
2024-06-27 | House | Transmitted |
2024-06-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 289 Yeas 88 Nays 22 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2024-06-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2024-06-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-06-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2024-06-18 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-06-18 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2024-03-06 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/05/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2024-03-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-03-05 | House | Introduced By Representative Joseph Aragona |
Same As/Similar To
HB5536 (Same As) 2024-07-30 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Affairs