MI HB5559 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Assigned Pa 215'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Assigned Pa 215'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Recreation; trails; statewide trail network; include Pure Michigan Trails and authorize department of natural resources to grant easements, use permits, concessions, and leases. Amends secs. 1301 & 72108 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.1301 & 324.72108). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5553'14, SB 0873'14, SB 0875'14, SB 0876'14, SB 0877'14
Title
Recreation; trails; statewide trail network; include Pure Michigan Trails and authorize department of natural resources to grant easements, use permits, concessions, and leases. Amends secs. 1301 & 72108 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.1301 & 324.72108). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5553'14, SB 0873'14, SB 0875'14, SB 0876'14, SB 0877'14
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 440 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 357 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 357 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-16 | House | Assigned Pa 215'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-07-16 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/26/2014 @ 1:34 Pm |
2014-07-16 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/26/2014 @ 12:53 Pm |
2014-07-16 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/18/2014 @ 3:02 Pm |
2014-06-12 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-06-12 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-06-12 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 440 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-06-05 | House | Transmitted |
2014-06-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 357 Yeas 106 Nays 2 |
2014-06-05 | House | Amended |
2014-06-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-06-03 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-06-03 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-05-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-05-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-05-13 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/09/2014 |
2014-05-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Tourism |
2014-05-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-05-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Dave Pagel |
Same As/Similar To
SB0876 (Same As) 2014-07-16 - Assigned Pa 0212'14 With Immediate Effect