MI HB5563 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 549'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 549'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; solid waste; abandoned vehicle disposal process for watercraft, snowmobiles, and ORVs; establish. Amends sec. 80125 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.80125) & adds secs. 80130f, 80130g, 80130h, 80130i, 80130j, 80130k, 80130l, 80130m, 80130n, 80130o, 80130p, 81151 & 82161.
Title
Environmental protection; solid waste; abandoned vehicle disposal process for watercraft, snowmobiles, and ORVs; establish. Amends sec. 80125 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.80125) & adds secs. 80130f, 80130g, 80130h, 80130i, 80130j, 80130k, 80130l, 80130m, 80130n, 80130o, 80130p, 81151 & 82161.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 771 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 871 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 533 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 871 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 533 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 549'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/15/2015 @ 11:33 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/10/2015 @ 3:26 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 1/5/2015 @ 4:10 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-18 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-18 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-18 | House | Roll Call # 771 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2014-12-18 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-12-18 | House | Rule Suspended |
2014-12-18 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-12-18 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 871 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes |
2014-10-02 | House | Transmitted |
2014-10-02 | House | Title Amended |
2014-10-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 533 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2014-10-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-10-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-10-01 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2014-10-01 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2014-10-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-09-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-09-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2014-05-13 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/09/2014 |
2014-05-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2014-05-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-05-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Andrea Lafontaine |
Subjects
Environmental protection, solid waste
Vehicles, abandoned
Vehicles, off-road
Vehicles, snowmobiles
Watercraft, other
Vehicles, abandoned
Vehicles, off-road
Vehicles, snowmobiles
Watercraft, other