MI HB5570 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-13 - Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-13 - Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; guidelines for dissemination of deep fake sexual images; enact. Amends sec. 17b, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.17b).
Title
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; guidelines for dissemination of deep fake sexual images; enact. Amends sec. 17b, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.17b).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 165 (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety |
2024-06-12 | House | Transmitted |
2024-06-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 165 Yeas 108 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2024-06-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2024-06-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-06-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2024-05-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-05-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2024-03-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/13/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2024-03-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-03-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Matt Bierlein |
Subjects
Civil rights: privacy
Communications: Internet
Communications: other
Communications: social media
Communications: technology
Communications: video services
Crimes: other
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines
Communications: Internet
Communications: other
Communications: social media
Communications: technology
Communications: video services
Crimes: other
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines