MI HB5646 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Assigned Pa 126'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Assigned Pa 126'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; qualified voter file; maintenance of the statewide qualified voter file; require the secretary of state to check against the United States Social Security Administration's death master file and require the secretary of state to participate in multistate voter registration verification programs. Amends sec. 509o of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.509o).
Title
Elections; qualified voter file; maintenance of the statewide qualified voter file; require the secretary of state to check against the United States Social Security Administration's death master file and require the secretary of state to participate in multistate voter registration verification programs. Amends sec. 509o of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.509o).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 233 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 211 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 171 (Y: 101 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 211 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 171 (Y: 101 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Assigned Pa 126'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-05-03 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/3/2018 @ 11:28 Am |
2018-05-03 | House | Approved By The Governor 5/2/2018 @ 8:36 Pm |
2018-04-24 | House | Presented To The Governor 4/23/2018 @ 12:28 Pm |
2018-04-19 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-04-19 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-04-19 | House | Roll Call # 233 Yeas 107 Nays 2 |
2018-04-19 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2018-04-18 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-04-18 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 211 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections And Government Reform |
2018-03-15 | House | Transmitted |
2018-03-15 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 171 Yeas 101 Nays 5 |
2018-03-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-03-14 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-03-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-03-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-02-28 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/27/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2018-02-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-02-27 | House | Introduced By Representative Julie Calley |